This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:31:58 (UTC).

Hastings et al v. FCA US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Hastings filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04067

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liam Hastings

Trenton Hastings

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc.

Quadratec, Inc.

FCA US, LLC

Chrysler Group, LLC

Chrysler Corporation

Chrysler LLC

Daimler Chrysler

Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc. doing business as Skyjacker Suspension, Inc.

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Quadratec, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clyde Talbot Turner

Attorney at Turner & Associates, P.A.

4705 Somers Ave., Suite 100

North Little Rock, AR 72116

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Donald Howard Bacon

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge and Clark

2000 Regions Center, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3493

Bruce E. Munson

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

400 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Elizabeth A. Fletcher

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone

1900 Regions Center, 400 West Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201

Jessica P. Koehler

Attorney at Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP

200 W Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Edwin Lee Lowther, Jr.

Attorney at Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Bruce E. Munson

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

400 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Elizabeth A. Fletcher

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone

1900 Regions Center, 400 West Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), Crossclaim, FCA US'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT QUADRATEC, INC.'S CROSSCLAIM by FCA US, LLC.(Lowther, Edwin) Modified inserted document title on 7/22/2019. (mll) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

15 #6

Exhibit 5

15 #5

Exhibit 4

15 #4

Exhibit 3

15 #3

Exhibit 2

15 #2

Exhibit 1

15 #1

Appendix of Exhibits

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against FCA US, LLC, Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc. by Quadratec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc..(Bacon, Donald) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#1

(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Quadratec, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint), Crossclaim, FCA US'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT QUADRATEC, INC.'S CROSSCLAIM by FCA US, LLC.(Lowther, Edwin) Modified inserted document title on 7/22/2019. (mll) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint),, Crossclaim, Cross-Claim Answer by Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc..(Bacon, Donald) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Koehler on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Munson on behalf of Quadratec, Inc.. (Munson, Bruce) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quadratec, Inc.. (Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against FCA US, LLC, Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc. by Quadratec, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Fletcher, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liam Hastings. Quadratec, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC.(Lowther, Edwin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liam Hastings. FCA US, LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc.. (Bacon, Donald) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc..(Bacon, Donald) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lonnie McMurry's Four-Wheel-Drive-Center, Inc., Quadratec, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Quadratec, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lonnie McCurrys Four-Wheel-Drive Center, Inc. d/b/a Skyjacker Suspension, Inc. (McCurry) for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to FCA US LLC for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Turner, Clyde) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number AARWDC-1930999) filed by Liam Hastings, Trenton Hastings.(Turner, Clyde) Modified to correct parties filed against on 6/13/2019. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Liam Hastings, Trenton Hastings. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents. (mll) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quadratec, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRYSLER GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant