This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:10:22 (UTC).

Hassanien v. JUUL Labs Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Hassanien filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sandra J. Feuerstein and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06808

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amr Hassanien

Defendants

Pax Labs, Inc.

JUUL Labs Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Virginia E Anello

Attorney at Douglas & London, P.C.

111 John Street, Suite 1400

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Summons Pax Labs, Inc.

4 #2

Summons Altria Group, Inc.

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Pax Labs, Inc., #2 Summons Altria Group, Inc., #3 Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc.) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #3

Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc.

#5

(#5) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 16). IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO -16) IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Amr Hassanien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-08353, filed 12/20/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO -16) IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 16). IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Pax Labs, Inc., #2 Summons Altria Group, Inc., #3 Summons Philip Morris USA, Inc.) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketIncorrect Document Entry Information. Defendant was added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendant. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketFILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12123278 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Amr Hassanien. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.