This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 15:40:19 (UTC).

Hashmi et al v. 7-Eleven Inc

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Hashmi filed an Other lawsuit against 7-Eleven Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04090

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rehan Hashmi

Lykor Shack Inc.

Rehan S Hashmi

Defendant

7-Eleven Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C. Stevens, Jr.

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 W Washington St, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

Xiaoyin Cao

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 West Washington Stree, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

Carmen David Caruso

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 W. Washington Street, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Verhey

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Norman Mitchell Leon

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) MANDATE of USCA dated 6/22/20 regarding notice of appeal #43 ;USCA No.20-1371 ; No record to be returned. (aee, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#48

(#48) CERTIFIED copy of order dated 6/22/20 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #43 ; Appellate case no. : 20-1371. Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed on June 19, 2020, by counsel for the appellant, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (aee, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#47

(#47) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #43 ; USCA Case No. 20-1371 (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#46

(#46) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #43 . Notified counsel. (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #43 (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#44

(#44) DOCKETING Statement by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc. regarding notice of appeal #43 (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of appeal by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc. regarding orders #40 , #41 , #42 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-16788218. Receipt number: n (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#41

(#41) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/6/20.Mailed notice(ca, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#40

(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:For the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion and order, 7-Eleven's motion to dismiss #32 is granted. To the extent that the Plaintiffs submit that they may sue because they are consumers, they are incorrect. To the extent that the Plaintiffs might be able to sue under the consumer nexus test, they have explicitly waived that argument. Because any amendment would be futile, the Plaintiffs' amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order].Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc.. (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc.. All Defendants. (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 8/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by James C. Stevens, Jr (Stevens, James) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rehan Hashmi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15941345.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MANDATE of USCA dated 6/22/20 regarding notice of appeal #43 ;USCA No.20-1371 ; No record to be returned. (aee, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CERTIFIED copy of order dated 6/22/20 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #43 ; Appellate case no. : 20-1371. Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed on June 19, 2020, by counsel for the appellant, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (aee, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #43 ; USCA Case No. 20-1371 (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #43 . Notified counsel. (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #43 (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) DOCKETING Statement by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc. regarding notice of appeal #43 (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of appeal by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc. regarding orders #40 , #41 , #42 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-16788218. Receipt number: n (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Courtroom Deputy on 2/6/20.Mailed notice(ca, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/6/20.Mailed notice(ca, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:For the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion and order, 7-Eleven's motion to dismiss #32 is granted. To the extent that the Plaintiffs submit that they may sue because they are consumers, they are incorrect. To the extent that the Plaintiffs might be able to sue under the consumer nexus test, they have explicitly waived that argument. Because any amendment would be futile, the Plaintiffs' amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order].Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc.. (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rehan S Hashmi, Lykor Shack Inc.. All Defendants. (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 8/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by James C. Stevens, Jr (Stevens, James) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rehan Hashmi by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rehan Hashmi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15941345.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Verhey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Norman M. Leon