This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 10:57:22 (UTC).

HARVEY v. VANDERBURGH COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 HARVEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against VANDERBURGH COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMIE HARVEY

Defendants

VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL

VANDERBURGH COUNTY

VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

DAVE WEDDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Frederick Biesecker

Attorney at BIESECKER DUTKANYCH & MACER, LLC

411 Main Street

Evansville, IN 47708

Taylor Jon Ferguson

Attorney at BIESECKER DUTKANYCH & MACER LLC (Indianapolis)

144 N. Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Craig R. Emig

Attorney at JONES WALLACE LLC

20 N.W. Third Street, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1065

Evansville, IN 47706

David L. Jones

Attorney at JONES WALLACE, LLC

20 N.W. Third Street, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1065

Evansville, IN 47706

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against a person or entity that can be sued , filed by Defendants VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Jones, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM against a person or entity that can be sued, filed by Defendants VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against Vanderburgh County , filed by Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY. (Jones, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against Vanderburgh County, filed by Defendant VANDERBURGH COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint (and Defendants' Affirmative Defenses; and Jury Trial Demand), filed by All Defendants.(Jones, David) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 11:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/25/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants VANDERBURGH COUNTY, VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DAVE WEDDING. (Jones, David) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Emig on behalf of Defendants VANDERBURGH COUNTY, VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DAVE WEDDING. (Emig, Craig) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Jones on behalf of Defendants VANDERBURGH COUNTY, VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DAVE WEDDING. (Jones, David) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by JAMIE HARVEY. VANDERBURGH COUNTY served on 2/3/2021; VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL served on 2/3/2021; VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT served on 2/3/2021; DAVE WEDDING served on 2/3/2021. (Ferguson, Taylor) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to VANDERBURGH COUNTY, VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DAVE WEDDING. (AAS) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Plaintiff JAMIE HARVEY. (Biesecker, Kyle) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Jon Ferguson on behalf of Plaintiff JAMIE HARVEY. (Ferguson, Taylor) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VANDERBURGH COUNTY, VANDERBURGH COUNTY JAIL, VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, DAVE WEDDING, filed by JAMIE HARVEY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6389991) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ferguson, Taylor) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VANDERBURGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor Jon Ferguson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Frederick Biesecker