This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2019 at 07:59:30 (UTC).

HARVEY v. STATE OF GEORGIA et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 HARVEY filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF GEORGIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER and THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

Referral Judge

THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY

Pelham, GA 31779

Defendants

JENNIFER BAXTER

MIKE MCCARTY

CHRISTOPHER GUAY

WHITFIELD COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

MELICIA KENDRICK

STATE OF GEORGIA

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia; Case Number 4:19-cv-245. (bcl) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/23/2019. (bcl) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#6

(#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION to Order Service by United States Marshal filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Trust Account Statement

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

1 #9

Envelope

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Case Related Documents

1 #4

Affidavit

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #1

Attachment to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibits - Case Related Documents, #6 Summons, #7 Cover Letter, #8 General Case Filing Information Form, #9 Envelope)(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia; Case Number 4:19-cv-245. (bcl) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/6/2019. (bcl) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 10/23/2019. (bcl) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Order Service by United States Marshal filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by REGINALD CHARLES HARVEY. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibits - Case Related Documents, #6 Summons, #7 Cover Letter, #8 General Case Filing Information Form, #9 Envelope)(bcl) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.