This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:41:57 (UTC).

Harvey v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Harvey filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00563

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Ann Harvey

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John David Hurst

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

50 Clay Street, Suite 1

Morgantown, WV 26501

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 2$ U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 1/2/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Document: Text Minute Order. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. New Jersey for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols on 1/2/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Document: Email of Text Order from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, regarding MDL No 2738 advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

5 #3

Envelope

5 #2

Letter to Clerk

5 #1

Schedule of Related Actions

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Actions. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Related Actions, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Joyce Ann Harvey (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by John David Hurst on behalf of Joyce Ann Harvey. (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5223947.), filed by Joyce Ann Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred from North Carolina Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:20-cv-00305, filed 01/08/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to District of New Jersey. File transmitted electronically via CM/ECF. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 2$ U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 1/2/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Document: Text Minute Order. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the D. New Jersey for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols on 1/2/2020. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Document: Email of Text Order from John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, regarding MDL No 2738 advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Related Actions. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Related Actions, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Joyce Ann Harvey (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by John David Hurst on behalf of Joyce Ann Harvey. (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Joyce Ann Harvey. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5223947.), filed by Joyce Ann Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Hurst, John) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less