This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 09:24:07 (UTC).

Hartzheim et al v. Newcleus et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Hartzheim filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Newcleus. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris, John Johnston and Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John Johnston

Presiding Judges

Brian Morris

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Doug Hartzheim

Richard Bratten

Defendants

Daniel Barbaree

William Borchert

Newcleus

Intergrated Financial Services of PA Inc. doing business as Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Devlan Geddes

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Defendant Attorneys

David L. Braverman

Attorney at BRAVERMAN KASKEY GARBER, P.C.

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, 56Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Amy D. Christensen

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN & PREZEAU, PLLP

314 North Last Chance Gulch, Suite 300

Helena, MT 59601

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit Richard Bratten Declaration

12 #1

Exhibit Doug Hartzheim Declaration

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Richard Bratten, Doug Hartzheim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doug Hartzheim Declaration, #2 Exhibit Richard Bratten Declaration) (Gardner, Trent) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Daniel Barbaree, William Borchert, Intergrated Financial Services of PA, Newcleus re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Braverman, Esquire (Braverman, David) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - David L. Braverman for Defendants. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/7/2021. (ASG) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION David L. Braverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendants ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2660150.) Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#8

(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Newcleus. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Amended Affidavit of Barbaree. (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

7 #2

Affidavit Aff. of Barbaree

7 #1

Brief In Support of MTD

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of MTD, #2 Affidavit Aff. of Barbaree) (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead on or before April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/19/2021. (ASG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Judge Brian Morris no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/19/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Answer Due 4/30/2021 Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus Motions referred to John Johnston. (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

3 #3

Affidavit of Service-Barbaree

3 #2

Affidavt of Service-Borchert

3 #1

Affidavit of Service-Integrated Financial Services of PA, Inc., d/b/a Bank Fina

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Newcleus, LLC; Integrated Financial Services of PA, Inc.; William Borchert; Daniel Barbaree on 3/26/2021, filed by Richard Bratten, Doug Hartzheim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service-Integrated Financial Services of PA, Inc., d/b/a Bank Financial Services Grou, #2 Affidavt of Service-Borchert, #3 Affidavit of Service-Barbaree) (Gardner, Trent) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Richard Bratten, Doug Hartzheim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doug Hartzheim Declaration, #2 Exhibit Richard Bratten Declaration) (Gardner, Trent) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Daniel Barbaree, William Borchert, Intergrated Financial Services of PA, Newcleus re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David L. Braverman, Esquire (Braverman, David) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - David L. Braverman for Defendants. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/7/2021. (ASG) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION David L. Braverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendants ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2660150.) Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Newcleus. Amendment to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Amended Affidavit of Barbaree. (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of MTD, #2 Affidavit Aff. of Barbaree) (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead on or before April 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/19/2021. (ASG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. (ACC) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Judge Brian Morris no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/19/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Answer Due 4/30/2021 Amy D. Christensen appearing for Defendant Newcleus Motions referred to John Johnston. (Christensen, Amy) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Newcleus, LLC; Integrated Financial Services of PA, Inc.; William Borchert; Daniel Barbaree on 3/26/2021, filed by Richard Bratten, Doug Hartzheim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service-Integrated Financial Services of PA, Inc., d/b/a Bank Financial Services Grou, #2 Affidavt of Service-Borchert, #3 Affidavit of Service-Barbaree) (Gardner, Trent) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Daniel Barbaree, William Borchert, Intergrated Financial Services of PA, Newcleus. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Intergrated Fncl Svc of PA, #2 Issued Summons - Borchert, #3 Issued Summons - Barbaree) Counsel is directed to download and print the summonses for service . (ACC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2638304 (ACC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Doug Hartzheim, Richard Bratten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agrmnt to Preserve Trail Income - Hartzheim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Agrmnt to Preserve Trail Income - Bratten, #3 Exhibit 3 - 11-20-20 BK Ltr to Hartzheim, #4 Exhibit 4 - 11-20-20 BK Ltr to Bratten, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trent M. Gardner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Devlan Geddes