This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:09:32 (UTC).

HARTY v. W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 HARTY filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against W2005/Fargo Hotels Pool C Realty, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01798

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owen Harty

Defendant

W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F. Ward

Attorney at Thomas B. Bacon, P.A.

329 South Devon Avenue

Wayne, PA 19087

Defendant Attorneys

EILEEN KEEFE

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Ste. 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Kyle I. Platt

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C.

1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Eileen K Keefe

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS, P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry St, Ste. 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 12/10/2020 11:40 AM before Honorable Robert D. Mariani. The telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. At least five days prior to the Case Management Conference, counsel for the plaintiff shall provide the court, via e-filing, a call-in number which the court and counsel for all parties of record may call to connect to the conference call. The completed Joint Case management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/23/20. (jam) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP.(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#9

(#9) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/5/20. (ao) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04141 containing electronic documents. (ao) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. 3) IS GRANTED. THE CASE WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/22/20. 9/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE I. PLATT on behalf of W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP with Certificate of Service(PLATT, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP. (KEEFE, EILEEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN KEEFE on behalf of W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP with Certificate of Service(KEEFE, EILEEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Change Venue filed by OWEN HARTY.Certificate of Service.(WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shinkowski Investigations re: served Summons, Complaint, and Civil Forms upon W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP by personal service on 08/31/2020 (WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14515162.), filed by OWEN HARTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 08/24/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 12/10/2020 11:40 AM before Honorable Robert D. Mariani. The telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. At least five days prior to the Case Management Conference, counsel for the plaintiff shall provide the court, via e-filing, a call-in number which the court and counsel for all parties of record may call to connect to the conference call. The completed Joint Case management Plan must be filed at least 5 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/23/20. (jam) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP.(Keefe, Eileen) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 10/5/20. (ao) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-04141 containing electronic documents. (ao) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. 3) IS GRANTED. THE CASE WILL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 9/22/20. 9/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE I. PLATT on behalf of W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP with Certificate of Service(PLATT, KYLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP. (KEEFE, EILEEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN KEEFE on behalf of W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP with Certificate of Service(KEEFE, EILEEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Change Venue filed by OWEN HARTY.Certificate of Service.(WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shinkowski Investigations re: served Summons, Complaint, and Civil Forms upon W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP by personal service on 08/31/2020 (WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty, LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14515162.), filed by OWEN HARTY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(WARD, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/2/2020.] (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W2005/Fargo Hotels (Pool C) Realty LP is a litigant