This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 07:32:05 (UTC).

HARTT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INC., v. BALL et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 HARTT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INC , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BALL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02501

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INC.,

Defendants

CHRASHAUNA S. BALL

BHF LOGISTICS INC

JOHN DOES 1-5

XYZ COMPANIES 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY A. SEGAL

Attorney at SALMON, RICCHEZZA, SINGER & TURCHI, LLP

123 Egg Harbor Road, Suite 406

Sewell, NJ 08080

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS F. GALLAGHER

Attorney at THOMAS PASCHOS & ASSOCIATE SPC

30 N. Haddon Avenue, Suite 200

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13372938), filed by HARTT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INC.,.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS F. GALLAGHER on behalf of CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC (GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC.(GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/20/22. (LM, ) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/20/22. (LM, ) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC.(GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #3 submitted by BHF LOGISTICS INC, CHRASHAUNA S. BALL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/18/2022. (sm) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS F. GALLAGHER on behalf of CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC (GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CHRASHAUNA S. BALL, BHF LOGISTICS INC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13372938), filed by HARTT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, INC.,.(SEGAL, JEFFREY) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less