This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 07:44:22 (UTC).

Hartman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Hartman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-82109

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Hartman

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim International (GmbH)

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Glaxosmithkline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.

Pfizer Inc

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.

Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC

Chattem Inc.

John Does (1-10)

Jane Does 1-10

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Doe Unincorporated Organizations 1-10

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph T. Rosenbaum

Attorney at Fujiwara and Rosenbaum, LLL

1100 Alakea St., 20Th Fl., Ste B

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2599500.), filed by Ruth Hartman.(Rosenbaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons

4 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#7

(#7) (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) MINUTE ORDER re CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) Finalized on 11/15/2021 - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 11/15/2021. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Florida for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) Letter from the Southern District of Florida forwarding certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-82) and directing electronic transfer of case, dated November 17, 2021. (jo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

10 #10

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

10 #1

*Restricted*

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#12) MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Hawaii. Case Number 1:21-cv-00428 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82109-RLR Hartman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 82. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from Hawaii; Case Number 1:21-cv-00428. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from the Southern District of Florida forwarding certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-82) and directing electronic transfer of case, dated November 17, 2021. (jo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) MINUTE ORDER re CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) Finalized on 11/15/2021 - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 11/15/2021. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Florida for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) - Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/27/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00428 RT on all further pleadings. (jni) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2599500.), filed by Ruth Hartman.(Rosenbaum, Joseph) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant