This case was last updated from PACER on 06/15/2021 at 15:02:45 (UTC).

Hartford v. Kohl's Michigan L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Hartford filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kohl's Michigan L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-10855

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Hartford

Defendants

KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES

Kohl's Michigan L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A. Iafrate

Attorney at Logeman, Iafrate,

2950 S. State Street, Suite 400

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Defendant Attorney

Marsha E. Harris

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC

32605 West Twelve Mile Road, Suite 300

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

(#9) STIPULATED ORDER amending caption. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/29/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 5/3/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#7

(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#6

(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Logeman, Adrienne) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha E. Harris on behalf of KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Michigan, L.P. for KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-003471-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8429170 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: James A. Iafrate re #10 Certificate of Service, #11 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) [STRICKEN PER NOTICE OF ERROR] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants for Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures (Harris, Marsha) Modified on 6/10/2021 (LGra). (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [STRICKEN PER NOTICE OF ERROR] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patricia Hartford - P's Initial Disclosures (Iafrate, James) Modified on 6/10/2021 (LGra). (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED ORDER amending caption. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/29/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 5/3/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 5/26/2021. (DPar) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Logeman, Adrienne) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha E. Harris on behalf of KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Michigan, L.P. for KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES. (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 21-003471-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8429170 - Fee: $ 402 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Harris, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kohl's Michigan, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant