This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2020 at 09:50:03 (UTC).

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06123

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAN JAY CHARKEY

Attorney at WHITE AND WILLIAMS LLP

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 400

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-2220

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC. served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Hartford Financial as Corporate Parent.. (CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10836220), filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC. served on 7/7/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROOK TRAILER SERVICE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Hartford Financial as Corporate Parent.. (CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10836220), filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHARKEY, ALAN) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less