This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:54:04 (UTC).

Hartford Courant Company, LLC v. Carroll et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Hartford Courant Company, LLC filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Carroll. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01951

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hartford Courant Company, LLC

Defendants

Tammy Fluet

Julie Vanam

Marci Young

James Quinn

Robert Burke

Richard L. Haas, Jr.

Robert A. Wilock, II

Ann-Margaret Archer

William M. Hoey

Geoffrey Stowell

Ralph Dagostine

Antonio D'Addeo

Mark Shea

Judith Lee

Jill Driscoll

Lisa C. Groody

Laura A. Leigh

Gina Pickett

Kerri Hall

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexa Talin Millinger

Attorney at Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd

20 Church St.

Hartford, CT 06103

William S. Fish, Jr.

Attorney at Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd

20 Church St.

Hartford, CT 06103

KatieLynn B Townsend

Attorney at Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

1156 15Th St. Nw, Suite 1020

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Skold

Attorney at State of Connecticut Office of the Attorney General

165 Capitol Avenue, Ste 5000

Hartford, CT 06106

Alma Rose Nunley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

165 Capitol Avenue, Ste 5000

Hartford, CT 06106

Mark F. Kohler

Attorney at Connecticut Office of the Attorney General

165 Capitol Avenue, Ste 5000

Hartford, CT 06106

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr, Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr, Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young.(Nunley, Alma) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 7, 2020 To file Their Answer and Rule 26(f) Report #1 Complaint,,, by Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr, Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr, Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young. (Skold, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by KatieLynn B Townsend on behalf of Hartford Courant Company, LLC (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#16

(#16) Amended AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) Signed By Katielynn Townsend filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Fish, William) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#16) Amended AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) Signed By Katielynn Townsend filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Fish, William) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 7, 2020 To file Their Answer and Rule 26(f) Report #1 Complaint,,, by Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr, Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr, Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young. (Skold, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr, Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr, Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young.(Nunley, Alma) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines:( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/7/2020), Answer deadline updated for Ann-Margaret Archer to 2/7/2020; Karen A. Berris to 2/7/2020; Robert Burke to 2/7/2020; Patrick L. Carroll, III to 2/7/2020; Antonio D'Addeo to 2/7/2020; Ralph Dagostine to 2/7/2020; Cynthia Degoursey to 2/7/2020; Jill Driscoll to 2/7/2020; Caroline Fargeorge to 2/7/2020; Tammy Fluet to 2/7/2020; David S. Gage to 2/7/2020; Eric R. Groody to 2/7/2020; Lisa C. Groody to 2/7/2020; Richard L. Haas, Jr to 2/7/2020; Kerri Hall to 2/7/2020; William M. Hoey to 2/7/2020; Judith Lee to 2/7/2020; Laura A. Leigh to 2/7/2020; Debora Kaszuba Neary to 2/7/2020; Cara Parkinson to 2/7/2020; Brandon Pelegano to 2/7/2020; Gina Pickett to 2/7/2020; James Quinn to 2/7/2020; Jennifer Robinson to 2/7/2020; Mark Shea to 2/7/2020; Roy Smith, Jr to 2/7/2020; Giovanni Spennato to 2/7/2020; Geoffrey Stowell to 2/7/2020; Haralabos Valassis to 2/7/2020; Julie Vanam to 2/7/2020; Robert A. Wilock, II to 2/7/2020; Brandi Yanavich to 2/7/2020; Marci Young to 2/7/2020. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER. The defendants' #20 motion for extension of time until February 7, 2020 to file their Answer and the Rule 26(f) Report is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/30/2020. (Hausmann, Amy) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 7, 2020 To file Their Answer and Rule 26(f) Report #1 Complaint,,, by Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr, Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr, Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young. (Skold, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by KatieLynn B Townsend on behalf of Hartford Courant Company, LLC (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/07/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Amended AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) Signed By Katielynn Townsend filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Fish, William) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. All Defendants. (Millinger, Alexa) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,,, filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/11/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/11/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2020. Discovery due by 6/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Attorney(s) KatieLynn Townsend to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586904) by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of KatieLynn Townsend in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fish, William) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Fish, William) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Talin Millinger on behalf of The Hartford Courant Company, LLC (Millinger, Alexa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Fish, William) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Ann-Margaret Archer, Karen A. Berris, Robert Burke, Patrick L. Carroll, III, Antonio D'Addeo, Ralph Dagostine, Cynthia Degoursey, Jill Driscoll, Caroline Fargeorge, Tammy Fluet, David S. Gage, Eric R. Groody, Lisa C. Groody, Richard L. Haas, Jr., Kerri Hall, William M. Hoey, Judith Lee, Laura A. Leigh, Debora Kaszuba Neary, Cara Parkinson, Brandon Pelegano, Gina Pickett, James Quinn, Jennifer Robinson, Mark Shea, Roy Smith, Jr., Giovanni Spennato, Geoffrey Stowell, Haralabos Valassis, Julie Vanam, Robert A. Wilock, II, Brandi Yanavich, Marci Young ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5586539.), filed by Hartford Courant Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andrew Julien)(Fish, William) Modified to update parties on 12/11/2019 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.