Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:37:20 (UTC).

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NANO DENTISTRY PA

Consolidated Plaintiff

HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ

Attorney at PRETI, FLAHERTY

One City Center, P.O. Box 9546

Portland, ME 04112-9546

DANA M. HORTON

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE, LLP

One Financial Plaza, Suite 1430

Providence, RI 02903

SEAN P. JOYCE

Attorney at JOYCE & JOYCE LLC

75 Pearl St., Suite 204

Portland, ME 04101

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER KONZELMANN

Attorney at WHITE AND WILLIAMS LLP

1650 Market Street, 18Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JAMES E. BELLEAU

Attorney at TRAFTON, MATZEN, BELLEAU & FRENETTE, LLP

10 Minot Avenue, P. O. Box 470

Auburn, ME 04212

Defendant Attorney

JOHN S. WHITMAN

Attorney at RICHARDSON, WHITMAN, LARGE & BADGER

465 Congress Street, P.O. Box 9545

Portland, ME 04112-9545

 

Court Documents

13 #3

Exhibit C- Case Law in Support of Motion

13 #2

Exhibit B-1/31/20 Complaint

13 #1

Exhibit A- 1/30/20 Complaint

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY in support of #12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (consented to by all parties) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 1/30/20 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-1/31/20 Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Case Law in Support of Motion)(HORTON, DANA) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (consented to by all parties) by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 4/13/2020. (HORTON, DANA) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Extend Time 3/31/2020 to file Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC Responses due by 3/30/2020. (WHITMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#8

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to March 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NANO DENTISTRY PA, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC served on 2/5/2020. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#5

(#5) **FILED IN ERROR**Summons Issued as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) Modified on 2/4/2020 to add Filed in Error notation per request of the filer. Filer to re-file. (clp). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana M. Horton filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2160019.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NANO DENTISTRY PA. (bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NANO DENTISTRY PA, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/30/2020) Fee due by 2/3/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This matter is consolidated with Case No. 2:20-cv-00032-DBH. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY in support of #12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (consented to by all parties) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 1/30/20 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-1/31/20 Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Case Law in Support of Motion)(HORTON, DANA) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (consented to by all parties) by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 4/13/2020. (HORTON, DANA) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC due by 4/30/2020.; Reset Answer Deadline for HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020: Answer due by 4/30/2020. (clp) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC per Order #11: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/31/2020. (clp) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement. Time is extended to March 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Extend Time 3/31/2020 to file Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC Responses due by 3/30/2020. (WHITMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/10/2020. (clp) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketReset Answer Deadline for HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC per order #9: Answer due by 3/31/2020. (clp) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to March 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC per #7 Summons Returned Executed served on 2/5/2020: Answer due by 2/26/2020. (clp) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NANO DENTISTRY PA, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC served on 2/5/2020. (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **FILED IN ERROR**Summons Issued as to HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) Modified on 2/4/2020 to add Filed in Error notation per request of the filer. Filer to re-file. (clp). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney DANA M. HORTON must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/7/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana M. Horton filed by SIGMUND D. SCHUTZ on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2160019.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2159847.), filed by NANO DENTISTRY PA, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(SCHUTZ, SIGMUND) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NANO DENTISTRY PA. (bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HAIER AMERICA COMPANY LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by NANO DENTISTRY PA, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/30/2020) Fee due by 2/3/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY THE(ERRONEOUSLY is a litigant