This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 08:51:55 (UTC).

Hartfield v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Hartfield filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00471

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Hartfield

Claimant

Steven E Hovsepian

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Hovsepian

Attorney at Barbas, Nunez, Sanders, Butler & Hovsepian

1802 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33606-1852

Defendant Attorney

William Cleveland Acree, II

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (HAI) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Andrea Hartfield. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17353123) filed by Andrea Hartfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Defendant's motion is granted to the extent Defendant may amend its Answer. Defendant may file an amended answer by November 16, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (SMB) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Acree, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (HAI) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Andrea Hartfield. (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-471-Oc-30PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17353123) filed by Andrea Hartfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Hovsepian