This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:33:00 (UTC).

Hart v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Hart filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar, Steven C. Yarbrough and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Presiding Judges

Steven C. Yarbrough

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Hart

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather K Hansen

Attorney at Blazejewski & Hansen, LLC

503 Slate Ave Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Eva K. Blazejewski

Attorney at Law Offices of Eva K. Blazejewski

6000 Uptown Blvd., Ne, Ste 450

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Defendant Attorney

John S. Stiff

Attorney at John S. Stiff & Associates, LLC

400 Gold Avenue, Sw, Suite 1300W

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Hart Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Hansen, Heather) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #12 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. The Telephone Scheduling Conference scheduled for 08/01/2019 is VACATED and rescheduled for 08/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline for Defendant to File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan "JSR" by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/1/2019. (kc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-02870. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Hart Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Hansen, Heather) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #12 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. The Telephone Scheduling Conference scheduled for 08/01/2019 is VACATED and rescheduled for 08/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant To File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan. JSR due 07/23/2019. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline for Defendant to File Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan "JSR" by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stiff, John) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2019. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/1/2019. (kc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (mnb) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6472163 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-02870. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stiff, John) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.