This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 11:07:20 (UTC).

Hart v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Hart filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Carolyn K. Delaney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00657

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Claimant

Norma Hart

Defendants

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company

DXC Technology Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arlo Garcia Uriarte

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Daniel Pascual Iannitelli

Attorney at Liberation Law Group

2760 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Claimant Attorney

Un Kei Wu

Attorney at Liberation Law Group, P.C.

2760 Mission St

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant Attorneys

Kate Elsa Juvinall

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

4801 Main St., Suite 1000

Kansas City, CA 64112

Andrew J. Weissler, PHV

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/15/19. (Coll, A) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Un Kei Wu on behalf of Norma Hart. Attorney Wu, Un Kei added. (Wu, Un Kei) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company for attorney Andrew J. Weissler to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Weissler, Andrew J. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8258863) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District Missouri)(Weissler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION for EXTENSION of TIME to Respond to Complaint by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Juvinall, Kate) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#3) PROOF OF SERVICE re Initial Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Juvinall, Kate) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

2 #2

VDRP

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

1 #5

Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration of Ira Katz

1 #2

Declaration of Kate E. Juvinall

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00249306 by Hewlett Packard. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8217744) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Kate E. Juvinall, #3 Declaration of Ira Katz, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/15/19. (Coll, A) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Un Kei Wu on behalf of Norma Hart. Attorney Wu, Un Kei added. (Wu, Un Kei) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Minute Order served on Daniel Pascual Iannitelli. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order (ECF No. 5). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company for attorney Andrew J. Weissler to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Weissler, Andrew J. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8258863) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District Missouri)(Weissler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION for EXTENSION of TIME to Respond to Complaint by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Juvinall, Kate) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROOF OF SERVICE re Initial Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by DXC Technology Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Juvinall, Kate) Modified on 5/2/2019 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00249306 by Hewlett Packard. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8217744) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Kate E. Juvinall, #3 Declaration of Ira Katz, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Juvinall, Kate) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DXC TECHNOLOGY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Un Kei Wu(Designation Retained)