This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:04:24 (UTC).

Hart v. Curry County Adult Detention Center et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Hart filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Curry County Adult Detention Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha Vazquez and Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01078

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha Vazquez

Referral Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myrtis Paulo Hart

Los Lunas, NM 87031-1328

Defendants

Curry County Adult Detention Center

Sheriff Department

Police Department

Department of Public Health

Department of Public Safety

FBI

Department of Transportation

Ms Luis

Mr Centino

Mark Gallegos

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (arp) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Myrtis Paulo Hart in Reference to Communication via broadcast. (gr) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#3

(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT to Complaint by Myrtis Paulo Hart (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of First Judicial District Court of New Mexico Complaint by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants; adding Ms Luis, Mr Centino and Mark Gallegos., filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (mjr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis no later than 30 days from the date of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a blank in forma pauperis motion to Plaintiff. (nlb) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Amended Complaint. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Amended Complaint. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis no later than 30 days from the date of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a blank in forma pauperis motion to Plaintiff. (nlb) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants; adding Ms Luis, Mr Centino and Mark Gallegos., filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (mjr) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of First Judicial District Court of New Mexico Complaint by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (gr) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT to Complaint by Myrtis Paulo Hart (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Myrtis Paulo Hart in Reference to Communication via broadcast. (gr) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (arp) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Department of Public Health is a litigant

Latest cases where Curry County Adult Detention Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Sheriffs Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Public Safety is a litigant