This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:27:54 (UTC).

Harry v. The City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Harry filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05951

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harry Rilton

Rilton Harry

Defendants

The City of New York

Police Officer Jose Fernandez

John Doe and Jane Doe #1-7

City Of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ugochukwu Uzoh

Attorney at Ugo Uzoh, P.C.

56 Willoughby Street, Third Floor, Ste Third Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

John L Garcia

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church St.

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City Of New York served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020; Jose Fernandez served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Jenny, Secretary. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rilton Harry..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John L Garcia on behalf of City Of New York..(Garcia, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/4/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, Jose Fernandez..(dnh) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York and P.O. Jose Fernandez [Shield #626], re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilton Harry..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York and P.O. Daniel Rogers [Shield #2532], re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Harry Rilton.(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) Modified on 7/31/2020 (sj). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Fernandez, John Doe and Jane Doe #1-7, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20932952)Document filed by Harry Rilton..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. City Of New York served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020; Jose Fernandez served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. Service was accepted by Jenny, Secretary. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rilton Harry..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John L Garcia on behalf of City Of New York..(Garcia, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/4/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, Jose Fernandez..(dnh) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York and P.O. Jose Fernandez [Shield #626], re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rilton Harry..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ugochukwu Uzoh to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): only parties as to whom the summons is for can be listed in docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ugochukwu Uzoh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rilton Harry. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN) : Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information..(rpr) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York and P.O. Daniel Rogers [Shield #2532], re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Harry Rilton.(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) Modified on 7/31/2020 (sj). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Fernandez, John Doe and Jane Doe #1-7, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20932952)Document filed by Harry Rilton..(Uzoh, Ugochukwu) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less