This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 08:15:18 (UTC).

Harry v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Harry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas E. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas E. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca Harry

Defendants

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Timothy Wilcoxson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damon L. Ellis

Attorney at MANI ELLIS & LAYNE

P. O. Box 1266

Charleston, WV 25326-1266

Defendant Attorney

Melvin F. O'Brien

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

Suite 501, 2001 Main Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #CHAR020534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Receipt) (lca) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Receipt

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 7/6/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 7/18/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 7/25/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 7/29/2022, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/3/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/15/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

#4

(#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (O'Brien, Melvin) (Modified on 6/21/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).

#5

(#5) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Timothy Wilcoxson. (O'Brien, Melvin) (Modified on 6/21/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/29/2022 is CANCELED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 8/12/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 7/3/2023 and complete all depositions by 8/15/2023. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 5/12/2023. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 6/30/2023. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 7/16/2023. Discovery to close - 8/15/2023. Dispositive motions deadline - 9/5/2023. Response to dispositive motion - 9/18/2023. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 9/25/2023. Settlement meeting - 11/6/2023. Motion in limine deadline - 11/13/2023. Responses for motions in limine - 11/20/2023. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 11/9/2023. Integrated pretrial order - 11/16/2023. Pretrial Conference on 12/21/2023 at 9:00 AM. Proposed jury charge - 1/2/2024. Final settlement conference on 12/21/2023 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 1/9/2024 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/27/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 7/29/2022 is CANCELED and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 8/12/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 7/3/2023 and complete all depositions by 8/15/2023. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 5/12/2023. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 6/30/2023. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 7/16/2023. Discovery to close - 8/15/2023. Dispositive motions deadline - 9/5/2023. Response to dispositive motion - 9/18/2023. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 9/25/2023. Settlement meeting - 11/6/2023. Motion in limine deadline - 11/13/2023. Responses for motions in limine - 11/20/2023. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 11/9/2023. Integrated pretrial order - 11/16/2023. Pretrial Conference on 12/21/2023 at 9:00 AM. Proposed jury charge - 1/2/2024. Final settlement conference on 12/21/2023 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 1/9/2024 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/27/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 26(f) PLANNING REPORT by Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Timothy Wilcoxson, Rebecca Harry. (Attachment: #1 Scheduling Order Checklist)(O'Brien, Melvin) (Modified on 7/22/2022 to add party filers) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Timothy Wilcoxson. (O'Brien, Melvin) (Modified on 6/21/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (O'Brien, Melvin) (Modified on 6/21/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (kew).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 7/6/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 7/18/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 7/25/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 7/29/2022, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 8/3/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/15/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #CHAR020534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Receipt) (lca) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melvin F. O'Brien