This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:05:53 (UTC).

HARRY v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HARRY filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK CO , INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05739

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAZEL HARRY

Defendants

MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.

MERCK & CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELIZABETH M WILKINS

Attorney at SCHLICHTER, BOGARD, & DENTON

1200 South 4Th Street, Suite 1200

Saint Louis, MO 63102

BRETT C. RISMILLER

Attorney at SCHLICHTER BOGARD & DENTON LLP

100 South 4Th St Suite 1200

St Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorney

DINO S. SANGIAMO

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

750 E Pratt St Ste 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HAZEL HARRY. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (WILKINS, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HAZEL HARRY. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (WILKINS, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207865.), filed by HAZEL HARRY.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HAZEL HARRY. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (WILKINS, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HAZEL HARRY. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (WILKINS, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket2 Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/6/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by HAZEL HARRY. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207865.), filed by HAZEL HARRY.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.