This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:01:17 (UTC).

HARRISS v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 HARRISS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCAS E HARRISS

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLAYTON BOWERS STUDSTILL

Attorney at STUDSTILL LAW FIRM PLLC - PORT ST JOE FL

304 Bailey Ln

Mexico Beach, FL 32456

MATTHEW DOUGLAS LANDAU

Attorney at THE LANDAU LAW GROUP PA - BOCA RATON FL

1200 N Federal Highway, Suite 200

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

ANNE E KEVLIN

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER - TAMPA FL

4830 West Kennedy Blvd, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

MICHAEL O'BRIEN COLGAN

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER OF STAY - The proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED and all deadlines TOLLED until further order of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/30/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#14

(#14) Unopposed First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/6/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy) (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#12

(#12) RULE 26(F) JOINT REPORT OF THE PARTIES, by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/14/2019 to correct pdf to match ECF - incorrect filing event utilized by filer (MB). (Entered: 05/11/2019)

#11

(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss Complaint, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff has 14 days to replead and either allege facts plausibly demonstrating standing or name the real party in interest as plaintiff. If no amended pleading is filed within that time, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is directed to close the file at that time. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/24/2019. (Deadline to replead case or close file by 5/8/2019.) (MB) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#6

(#10) ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss Complaint, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff has 14 days to replead and either allege facts plausibly demonstrating standing or name the real party in interest as plaintiff. If no amended pleading is filed within that time, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is directed to close the file at that time. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/24/2019. (Deadline to replead case or close file by 5/8/2019.) (MB) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/29/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (mailed via USPS to The Landau Law Group PA) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to The Landau Law Group PA) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (MB) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER OF STAY - The proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED and all deadlines TOLLED until further order of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/30/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 Unopposed First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (MB) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Unopposed First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/6/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy) (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 26(F) JOINT REPORT OF THE PARTIES, by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) Modified on 5/14/2019 to correct pdf to match ECF - incorrect filing event utilized by filer (MB). (Entered: 05/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines re #11 Amended Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/23/2019)). (MB) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER - The Motion to Dismiss Complaint, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff has 14 days to replead and either allege facts plausibly demonstrating standing or name the real party in interest as plaintiff. If no amended pleading is filed within that time, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is directed to close the file at that time. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/24/2019. (Deadline to replead case or close file by 5/8/2019.) (MB) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alernative, Count II of Complaint filed by LUCAS E HARRISS. (LANDAU, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Within Firm by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (COLGAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alernative, Count II of Complaint. (no response filed) (sdw) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alernative, Count II of Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/17/2019). (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/29/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (mailed via USPS to The Landau Law Group PA) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. (mailed via USPS to The Landau Law Group PA) (sdw) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit In and For Bay County, case number 2019-CA-000395. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442929.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (KEVLIN, ANNE) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less