This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:36:44 (UTC).

Harrison v. The Queen's Medical Center, et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 Harrison filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Queen's Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Harrison

Defendants

The Queen's Medical Center

Doe Defendants 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn A. Luiz

1132 Bishop Street, Ste 1520, 538-0500, Fax: 538-0600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Darin Robinson Leong

Attorney at Law Office of Darin R. Leong LLLC

1003 Bishop Street Ste 1500, 536-4900, Fax: 536-6700

Honolulu, HI 96813

Kristi K. O'Heron

Attorney at Marr Jones & Wang

1003 Bishop Street, Suite 1500

Honolulu, HI 96813

Megumi Sakae

Attorney at Marr Jones & Wang

1003 Bishop Street Ste 1500, 566-5665

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#12

(#12) Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant The Queen's Medical Center's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Megumi Sakae on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center. (Sakae, Megumi) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Darin Robinson Leong on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Queen's Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent The Queen's Health Systems for The Queen's Medical Center.. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON APRIL 2, 2019 [DOC 1] by The Queen's Medical Center.(Leong, Darin) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

5 #21

Defendant's Notice of Removal

5 #20

Return and Aknowledgment of Service

5 #19

Notice of Appearance as to Shawn A. Luiz, Esq.

5 #18

Additional Claims Information Sheet

5 #17

First Amended Complaint

5 #16

Filed Order Granting Michael Jay Green's Motion to Withdraw

5 #15

Filed Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Pre

5 #14

(Received) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension ot Time to Ser

5 #3

Civil Information Sheet

5 #2

Computerized Index

5 #1

Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re HAJIS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Luiz, Shawn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant The Queen's Medical Center's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Megumi Sakae on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center. (Sakae, Megumi) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Darin Robinson Leong on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#8) EO: Due to a conflict in Defendant's counsel schedule and by agreement of opposing counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for June 3, 2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/08/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 07/01/2019. Counsel Kristi K. O'Heron to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Queen's Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent The Queen's Health Systems for The Queen's Medical Center.. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED ON APRIL 2, 2019 [DOC 1] by The Queen's Medical Center.(Leong, Darin) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 18-1-0636 BIA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re HAJIS, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint, #5 Request for Exemption from CAAP, #6 Order from CAAP Granting Exemption Request, #7 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension to Serve Complaint, #8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension to file Pretrial Statement, #9 Michael Jay Green's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension to Serve Complaint, #11 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension to file Pretrial Statement, #12 Submission of Order re Michael Jay Green's Motion to Withdraw, #13 (Received) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement, #14 (Received) Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension ot Time to Serve Complaint, #15 Filed Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement, #16 Filed Order Granting Michael Jay Green's Motion to Withdraw, #17 First Amended Complaint, #18 Additional Claims Information Sheet, #19 Notice of Appearance as to Shawn A. Luiz, Esq., #20 Return and Aknowledgment of Service, #21 Defendant's Notice of Removal) (jo) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00207-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by The Queen's Medical Center. (Leong, Darin) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Queen's Medical Center DEFENDANT THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-0636-04 BIA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2190128), filed by The Queen's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darin R. Leong, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Leong, Darin) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Queen's Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn A. Luiz(Designation Retained)