This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:35:10 (UTC).

Harrison v. State of Maryland (Division of Corrections)

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Harrison filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Maryland Division of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03076

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Harrison

Westover, MD 21890

Defendant

State of Maryland (Division of Corrections)

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER granting granting #2 and #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/1/2020. (c/m 12/2/2020) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #2

Exhibit

4 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Maryland (Division of Corrections), filed by Stanley Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER giving plantiff 28 days to file an Amended Complaint and to either pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/28/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Maryland (Division of Corrections), filed by Stanley Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting granting #2 and #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/1/2020. (c/m 12/2/2020) (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stanley Harrison(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Maryland (Division of Corrections), filed by Stanley Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER giving plantiff 28 days to file an Amended Complaint and to either pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/28/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stanley Harrison(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Maryland (Division of Corrections), filed by Stanley Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less