This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 10:12:49 (UTC).

Harrison v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Harrison filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00668

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill A. Harrison

Salt Lake City, UT 84123

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court

SSA Notice

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/23/2020. (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (jl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR. (jl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to JOHN W. HUBER. (jl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Originally received by the court on 09/22/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jill A. Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/23/2020. (jl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 09/22/2020) filed by Plaintiff Jill A. Harrison. (dw) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less