This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2021 at 08:42:12 (UTC).

Sheryl Harrison v. Cook Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Sheryl Harrison filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Cook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11395

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheryl Harrison

Defendants

Cook Incorporated

Cook Group Incorporated

Cook Medical LLC f/k/a Cook Medical Incorporated

Cook Medical LLC doing business as Cook Medical Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradford Joe Gilde

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Conditional Transfer Order - 119 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2570, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Indiana and assigned to Honorable Richard L. Young. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison, (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29576319 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Attorney Bradford Joe Gilde added to party Sheryl Harrison(pty:pla))(Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Indiana, 1:21-cv-06312 filed 1/7/2021. (iv) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Conditional Transfer Order - 119 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2570, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Indiana and assigned to Honorable Richard L. Young. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison, (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29576319 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sheryl Harrison. (Attorney Bradford Joe Gilde added to party Sheryl Harrison(pty:pla))(Gilde, Bradford) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford Joe Gilde