This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2019 at 07:28:59 (UTC).

Harrison v. City of Chattanooga et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Harrison filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chattanooga. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger, Travis R McDonough and Harry S Mattice, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judges

Travis R McDonough

Harry S Mattice, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Harrison

Defendants

Kaumar Hughes

City of Chattanooga

Mathew Lynch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton M Whittaker

Attorney at McKoon, Williams, Atchley & Stanley, PLLC

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 1500

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Defendant Attorneys

Phillip A Noblett

Attorney at Office of the Chattanooga City Attorney

100 East 11Th Street, Suite 200

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Keith J Reisman

Attorney at Office of Chattanooga City Attorney

100 E. 11Th Street, Suite 200

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/9/19. (MRE, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#14

(#14) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Chattanooga, Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity), Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(individual capacity).(Noblett, Phillip) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip A Noblett on behalf of All Defendants (Noblett, Phillip) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

12 #1

Consent/Non-Consent

#12

(#12) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond by City of Chattanooga, Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity), Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(individual capacity). (Reisman, Keith) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. City of Chattanooga served on 3/7/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity) served on 2/21/2019; Mathew Lynch(individual capacity) served on 2/21/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity) served on 2/21/2019; Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity) served on 2/21/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry S. Mattice, Jr., United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 14, 2019. (AYB) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/13/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/12/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/12/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3889817.), filed by George Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/9/19. (MRE, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Chattanooga, Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity), Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(individual capacity).(Noblett, Phillip) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip A Noblett on behalf of All Defendants (Noblett, Phillip) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond by City of Chattanooga, Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity), Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity), Mathew Lynch(individual capacity). (Reisman, Keith) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. City of Chattanooga served on 3/7/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. Mathew Lynch(Officer, official capacity) served on 2/21/2019; Mathew Lynch(individual capacity) served on 2/21/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Harrison. Kaumar Hughes(individual capacity) served on 2/21/2019; Kaumar Hughes(Officer, official capacity) served on 2/21/2019. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry S. Mattice, Jr., United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 14, 2019. (AYB) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/13/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/12/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/12/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/12/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to City of Chattanooga, Kaumar Hughes, and Mathew Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kaumar Hughes, #2 Summons Mathew Lynch) (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3889817.), filed by George Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton M Whittaker