This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 07:06:19 (UTC).

Harris v. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Harris filed an Other lawsuit against Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey T. Miller and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02493

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey T. Miller

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Harris

Defendants

Woodbolt Distribution, LLC

Woodbolt Distribution, LLC doing business as Nutrabolt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory S. Weston

Attorney at The Weston Firm

1405 Morena Boulevard, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorney

J. Noah Hagey

Attorney at BraunHagey & Borden, LLP

351 California Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrew Harris (Weston, Gregory) (sjt). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a response on or before February 7,2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/27/2020. (jms) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Hagey, J.) (sjt). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Noah Hagey on behalf of Woodbolt Distribution, LLC (Hagey, J.)Attorney J. Noah Hagey added to party Woodbolt Distribution, LLC(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Harris. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC served. (Weston, Gregory) (sjt). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13316578.), filed by Andrew Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02493-JM-MDD. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Weston, Gregory)(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrew Harris (Weston, Gregory) (sjt). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a response on or before February 7,2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/27/2020. (jms) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Hagey, J.) (sjt). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Noah Hagey on behalf of Woodbolt Distribution, LLC (Hagey, J.)Attorney J. Noah Hagey added to party Woodbolt Distribution, LLC(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Harris. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC served. (Weston, Gregory) (sjt). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13316578.), filed by Andrew Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02493-JM-MDD. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Weston, Gregory)(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodbolt Distribution, LLC d/b/a Nutrabolt is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston