This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2021 at 08:58:44 (UTC).

Harris v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00308

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gussie Harris

Defendants

John 1-10 Does

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanda M. Yates

Attorney at BURNS & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

P. O. Box 16409

Jackson, MS 39236-6409

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Service of PLAINTIFF'S PRE-DISCOVERY Disclosure by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#4

(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Copies of Process and Pleadings Served on Wal Mart

1 #2

Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions

1 #1

Exhibit A - Lower Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:21-cv-00057-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4546763) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of Process and Pleadings Served on Wal Mart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Service of PLAINTIFF'S PRE-DISCOVERY Disclosure by Gussie Harris (Yates, Shanda) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:21-cv-00057-AHW. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4546763) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of Process and Pleadings Served on Wal Mart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanda M. Yates(Designation Retained)