This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2021 at 09:48:26 (UTC).

Harris v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Harris filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03934

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janet Harris

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc,

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacques Pierre Leeds

Attorney at Leeds Law Firm PLLC

700 Milam St, Ste 1300

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc,, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#5

(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury6 Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janet Harris, filed.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25536930) filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc,, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury6 Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janet Harris, filed.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25536930) filed by Janet Harris.(Leeds, Jacques) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less