This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 09:59:37 (UTC).

Harris v. State Farm Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Harris filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03195

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Harris

Defendant

State Farm Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allison Paige Takacs

Attorney at Ogborn Mihm, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2700

Denver, CO 80203

Michael Jon Ogborn

Attorney at Ogborn Mihm, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2700

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Emma Kathleen Knight

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 350

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 November 2020. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#17

(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of State Farm Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party State Farm Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#15

(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emma Kathleen Knight on behalf of State Farm Insurance CompanyAttorney Emma Kathleen Knight added to party State Farm Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Paige Takacs on behalf of Michael HarrisAttorney Allison Paige Takacs added to party Michael Harris(pty:pla) (Takacs, Allison) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Jon Ogborn on behalf of Michael HarrisAttorney Michael Jon Ogborn added to party Michael Harris(pty:pla) (Ogborn, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#9

(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. Pursuant to the Order of Reference, this Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on November 30, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/23/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon State Farm Insurance Company on 10/05/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Insurance Company, filed by Michael Harris.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #9

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #8

Exhibit C

1 #6

Exhibit A - Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Company from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30767. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7558859), filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Amended Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A - DRO, #6 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 November 2020. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell on behalf of State Farm Insurance CompanyAttorney Robert Alan Zahradnik-Mitchell added to party State Farm Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Zahradnik-Mitchell, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emma Kathleen Knight on behalf of State Farm Insurance CompanyAttorney Emma Kathleen Knight added to party State Farm Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Knight, Emma) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Allison Paige Takacs on behalf of Michael HarrisAttorney Allison Paige Takacs added to party Michael Harris(pty:pla) (Takacs, Allison) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Jon Ogborn on behalf of Michael HarrisAttorney Michael Jon Ogborn added to party Michael Harris(pty:pla) (Ogborn, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 October 2020. Pursuant to the Order of Reference, this Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on November 30, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/23/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/27/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/27/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon State Farm Insurance Company on 10/05/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Insurance Company, filed by Michael Harris.(alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Insurance Company from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30767. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7558859), filed by State Farm Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Amended Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A - DRO, #6 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less