This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2020 at 09:02:24 (UTC).

Harris v. Standard Guaranty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 Harris filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Ott and Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00335

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John E Ott

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martha C Harris

Birmingham, AL 35210

Defendants

Wells Fargo Companies

Standard Guaranty Insurance Company

Crawford & Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M Busby

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emily Burke

Attorney at BURR AND FORMAN

420 North 20Th Street, Ste. 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

13 #1

Exhibit

#12

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

6 #1

A-K

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to serve summons by Martha C Harris. (KAM) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:20-cv-335-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER TO REASSIGN - Full consent is not possible within that period, and, accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to reassign this action to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 5/5/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John E Ott: Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2020. (BST, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Crawford & Company, Wells Fargo Companies. mailed certified mail (KAM) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Martha C Harris. (KEK) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Martha C Harris. (KEK) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott. The consent deadline is extended until 5/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/28/2020. (KAM) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company re #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Busby, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Busby, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Burke, Emily) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER defendant shall respond to the #7 Motion to Remand by April 22, 2020; Plaintiff may reply by April 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/9/2020. (KAM) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Roderick R. Harris, Administrator of the Estate of Martha C Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JLC) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Martha C Harris. (Attachments: #1 A-K)(KEK) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge on 5/4/20 unless they unanimously consent to jurisdiction by the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 4/20/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E. Ott; parties to call in as directed; if all parties submit an executed form 24 hours in advance, the telephone conference will be cancelled; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/20/20. (BST, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion by April 3, 2020; Movant may reply by April 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 3/20/2020. (SJB) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Busby, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601104771 (KAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company from Jefferson County, case number 2020-cv-29., filed by Standard Guaranty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crawford and Company is a litigant

Latest cases where STANDARD GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily C. Burke