This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:08:42 (UTC).

Harris v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14116

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Harris

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Actavis LLC

Hospira, Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Sandoz Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Sandoz, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Panagiotis V. Albanis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

12800 University Dr - Ste 600, Po Box 9504

Ft Myers, FL 33906

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (ss) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8010691) filed by Debra Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Panagiotis V. Albanis added to party Debra Harris(pty:pla).(Albanis, Panagiotis) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (ss) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8010691) filed by Debra Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Panagiotis V. Albanis added to party Debra Harris(pty:pla).(Albanis, Panagiotis) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.