This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:46 (UTC).

Harris v. Roe et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Harris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Roe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05502

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Harris

Defendants

Ron Freeman

Jeffrey Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zack Greenamyre

Attorney at Mitchell & Shapiro, LLP

3490 Piedmont Road, Ne, Suite 650

Atlanta, GA 30305

Samantha Jill Funt

Attorney at Mitchell & Shapiro LLP

3490 Piedmont Road, Suite 650

Atlanta, GA 30305

William J.S. Atkins

Attorney at Edmond, Lindsay & Atkins, LLP

344 Woodward Ave., Se

Atlanta, GA 30312

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah L. Dance

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

Kenneth Edward Jarrard

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

Kenneth Paul Robin

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

 

Court Documents

#1

Submission of #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and #2 MOTION for Permanent and Preliminary Injunction to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Verification of Plantiff

2 #1

Brief

#2

(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Permanent and Preliminary Injunction filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth P. Robin (Ex. A), #2 Exhibit 1 to Robin Decl. (KEJ 12-23-19 correspondence), #3 Exhibit 2 to Robin Decl. (KPR 12-27-19 email), #4 Exhibit 3 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-2-20 email), #5 Exhibit 4 to Robin Decl. (ZG 1-6-20 email), #6 Exhibit 5 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-9-20 am email), #7 Exhibit 6 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-9-20 pm email), #8 Exhibit 7 to Robin Decl. (ZG 1-15-20 email), #9 Exhibit 8 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-21-20 email), #10 Exhibit 9 to Robin Decl. (KEJ 1-23-20 email), #11 Affidavit of Jeffrey D. Roe (Ex. B), #12 Exhibit 1 to Roe Decl. (10-28-19 Incident Report), #13 Exhibit 2 to Roe Decl. (10-28-19 email), #14 Exhibit 3 to Roe Decl. (Cockerham email statement), #15 Exhibit 4 to Roe Decl. (11-6-19 email to FCSO), #16 Exhibit 5 to Roe Decl. (11-18-19 email to FCSO), #17 Exhibit 6 to Roe Decl. (Fourth Amendment Waiver), #18 Exhibit 7 to Roe Decl. (Return of Search Warrant, Affidavit/Application), #19 Exhibit 8 to Roe Decl. (Property & Evidence Sheet), #20 Exhibit C (Cumming Police Department Incident Report))(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the page limit for Plaintiffs brief in support of her Motion for Injunctive Relief shall be extended. Plaintiff's brief, however, may not exceed thirty pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/9/19. (jpa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 #1

Summons Ron Freeman

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Roe and Ron Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ron Freeman)(ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#27

(#27) Consent JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#26

(#26) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 18-23, 2020, June 4-8, 2020, by Kenneth Paul Robin. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#25

(#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Division and Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(B) Defenses filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

24 #12

Exhibit 1 to Roe Decl. (10-28-19 Incident Report)

24 #11

Affidavit of Jeffrey D. Roe (Ex. B)

24 #10

Exhibit 9 to Robin Decl. (KEJ 1-23-20 email)

24 #9

Exhibit 8 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-21-20 email)

24 #8

Exhibit 7 to Robin Decl. (ZG 1-15-20 email)

24 #7

Exhibit 6 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-9-20 pm email)

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Consent JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #8 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Division and Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(B) Defenses, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 18-23, 2020, June 4-8, 2020, by Kenneth Paul Robin. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Division and Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(B) Defenses filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Permanent and Preliminary Injunction filed by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth P. Robin (Ex. A), #2 Exhibit 1 to Robin Decl. (KEJ 12-23-19 correspondence), #3 Exhibit 2 to Robin Decl. (KPR 12-27-19 email), #4 Exhibit 3 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-2-20 email), #5 Exhibit 4 to Robin Decl. (ZG 1-6-20 email), #6 Exhibit 5 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-9-20 am email), #7 Exhibit 6 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-9-20 pm email), #8 Exhibit 7 to Robin Decl. (ZG 1-15-20 email), #9 Exhibit 8 to Robin Decl. (KPR 1-21-20 email), #10 Exhibit 9 to Robin Decl. (KEJ 1-23-20 email), #11 Affidavit of Jeffrey D. Roe (Ex. B), #12 Exhibit 1 to Roe Decl. (10-28-19 Incident Report), #13 Exhibit 2 to Roe Decl. (10-28-19 email), #14 Exhibit 3 to Roe Decl. (Cockerham email statement), #15 Exhibit 4 to Roe Decl. (11-6-19 email to FCSO), #16 Exhibit 5 to Roe Decl. (11-18-19 email to FCSO), #17 Exhibit 6 to Roe Decl. (Fourth Amendment Waiver), #18 Exhibit 7 to Roe Decl. (Return of Search Warrant, Affidavit/Application), #19 Exhibit 8 to Roe Decl. (Property & Evidence Sheet), #20 Exhibit C (Cumming Police Department Incident Report))(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/17/20, 2/18/20, 2/19/20, 2/20/20, 2/21/20, 3/19/20, 3/20/20, 3/23/20, 4/6/20, 4/7/20, 4/8/20, 4/9/20, 4/10/20, by William J.S. Atkins. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Division and Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(B) Defenses filed by Ashley Harris. (Attachments: #1 Harris Declaration)(Greenamyre, Zack) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #20 the parties' Second Consent Motion to Amend the Courts Scheduling Order. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Injunctive Relief no later than January 23, 2020. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed no later than February 11, 2020. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/10/20. (ddm) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION to Amend #17 Order on Motion to Amend, (regarding briefing deadlines pertaining to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief) with Brief In Support by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Dance on behalf of Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe (Dance, Deborah) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Division and Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(B) Defenses with Brief In Support by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Fourth Amendment Waiver and Order), #2 Exhibit B (Final Disposition Felony Sentence with Probation))(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Georgia, Gainesville Divisionand Otherwise Raising All Pertinent FRCP 12(b) Defenses with Brief In Support by Ron Freeman, Jeffrey Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Fourth Amendment Waiver and Order), #2 Exhibit B (Final Disposition Felony Sentence With Probation))(Robin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the page limit for Plaintiffs brief in support of her Motion for Injunctive Relief shall be extended. Plaintiff's brief, however, may not exceed thirty pages. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/9/19. (jpa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/9/19. (bnw) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Roe and Ron Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ron Freeman)(ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and #2 MOTION for Permanent and Preliminary Injunction to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Ashley Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Permanent and Preliminary Injunction by Ashley Harris. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Harris (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDCC-9155027). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification of Plantiff)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to edit text on 12/6/2019 (ah). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.