This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:54:25 (UTC).

Harris v. Rives et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Harris filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Rives. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas B. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas B. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Marque Harris

Hopkinsville, KY 42240

Defendants

Christian County Jail Staff

Deputy Hurt

Lt. Rives

Deputy Hendricks

Sgt. Robertson

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#17

(#17) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#16

(#16) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#15

(#15) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#14

(#14) Letter by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

13 #1

Letter from Sixth Circuit

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) as to #10 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Brandon Marque Harris. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Sixth Circuit) (KJA) Modified on 7/12/2019 to edit file date (KJA). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2019) (KJA). (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/12/2019) (KJA). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

12 #1

USM 285

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Hendricks, Hurt, Rives, Robertson. Summons(es) sent to USM LV for service (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#11

(#11) SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/12/2019. Defendants' Pre-trial Memorandum due by 12/9/2019. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2019. Plaintiff's Pre-trial Memorandum due by 11/8/2019. The Clerk of Court shall issue summonses, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint (DN 1), the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, summonses, and this Service and Scheduling Order on Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A copy of the complaint (DN 1), the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order, and this Order shall also be mailed to the Christian County Attorney. Pro se prisoner handbook mailed to plaintiff per this order.cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Defendants Rives, Robertson, Hurt, and Hendricks, as directed above, Christian County Attorney, as directed above (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/12/2019. Christian County Jail Staff terminated. See order for specifics.cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Defendants Rives, Robertson, Hurt, and Hendricks, Christian County Attorney (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to re #8 Order, filed by Brandon Marque Harris, pro se. (JWM) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/16/2019 re #1 Complaint. Within 21 days of the entry date of this Order Plaintiff shall complete and file page 1 of this Court's approved 1983 complaint form and indicate whether he was a pretrial detainee or a convicted inmate at the time of the alleged incident. Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place the instant case number and word "Amended" on page 1 of the Court-approved 1983 complaint form and send it to Plaintiff for his completion. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (CDF) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/18/2019. Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Financial Section, USDC, WDKY, Christian County Jail, Inmate Acct. # 48888, 410 W. Seventh Street, Hopkinsville, KY 42240(KJA) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

1 #3

Mailing Envelope

1 #2

Summons Tendered

1 #1

Exhibit Form Regarding Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Christian County Jail Staff, Hendricks, Hurt, Rives, and Robertson, filed by Brandon Marque Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form Regarding Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, #2 Summons Tendered, #3 Mailing Envelope) (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Letter by Brandon Marque Harris. (KJA) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) as to #10 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Brandon Marque Harris. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Sixth Circuit) (KJA) Modified on 7/12/2019 to edit file date (KJA). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2019) (KJA). (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/12/2019) (KJA). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Issued as to Hendricks, Hurt, Rives, Robertson. Summons(es) sent to USM LV for service (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/12/2019. Defendants' Pre-trial Memorandum due by 12/9/2019. Discovery due by 10/9/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/9/2019. Plaintiff's Pre-trial Memorandum due by 11/8/2019. The Clerk of Court shall issue summonses, and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint (DN 1), the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, summonses, and this Service and Scheduling Order on Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A copy of the complaint (DN 1), the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order, and this Order shall also be mailed to the Christian County Attorney. Pro se prisoner handbook mailed to plaintiff per this order.cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Defendants Rives, Robertson, Hurt, and Hendricks, as directed above, Christian County Attorney, as directed above (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 6/12/2019. Christian County Jail Staff terminated. See order for specifics.cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Defendants Rives, Robertson, Hurt, and Hendricks, Christian County Attorney (KJA) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to re #8 Order, filed by Brandon Marque Harris, pro se. (JWM) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/16/2019 re #1 Complaint. Within 21 days of the entry date of this Order Plaintiff shall complete and file page 1 of this Court's approved 1983 complaint form and indicate whether he was a pretrial detainee or a convicted inmate at the time of the alleged incident. Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place the instant case number and word "Amended" on page 1 of the Court-approved 1983 complaint form and send it to Plaintiff for his completion. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (CDF) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/18/2019. Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff, pro se, Financial Section, USDC, WDKY, Christian County Jail, Inmate Acct. # 48888, 410 W. Seventh Street, Hopkinsville, KY 42240(KJA) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency filed by Brandon Marque Harris. (MNM) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Deficiency re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason for Deficiency: Motion Form and Summons. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/1/2019. (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandon Marque Harris (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon Marque Harris (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Christian County Jail Staff, Hendricks, Hurt, Rives, and Robertson, filed by Brandon Marque Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form Regarding Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, #2 Summons Tendered, #3 Mailing Envelope) (MNM) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less