This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:57:40 (UTC).

Harris v. Polis et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Harris filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Polis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P. Gallagher, Scott T. Varholak and Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02999

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judges

Gordon P. Gallagher

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Harris

Buena Vista, CO 81211

Defendants

Jared Polis

Williams

Dean Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua G. Urquhart

Attorney at Colorado Department of Law

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Rebekah Ryan

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit A - Docket

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Dean Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket)(Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Dean Williams. (Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua G. Urquhart on behalf of Dean WilliamsAttorney Joshua G. Urquhart added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft) (Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Ryan on behalf of Dean WilliamsAttorney Rebekah Ryan added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft) (Ryan, Rebekah) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Dean Williams waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

9 #1

USMS Form 285

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 USMS Form 285) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2020 This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2999-CMA (angar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/28/2020.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Emergency Injunction, by Plaintiff Mark Harris. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jared Polis, Dean Williams, filed by Mark Harris.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND TO FILE AN AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies by submitting a certified account statement and filing an amended complaint that provides a short and plain statement of each claim he is asserting within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/6/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Mark Harris. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against Jared Polis, Williams, filed by Mark Harris.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Dean Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket)(Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants shall file a Response to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 11/30/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dean Williams. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Dean Williams. (Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua G. Urquhart on behalf of Dean WilliamsAttorney Joshua G. Urquhart added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft) (Urquhart, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Ryan on behalf of Dean WilliamsAttorney Rebekah Ryan added to party Dean Williams(pty:dft) (Ryan, Rebekah) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM regarding #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Harris. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/4/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/2/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Dean Williams waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (angar, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 USMS Form 285) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2020 This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2999-CMA (angar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/28/2020.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Emergency Injunction, by Plaintiff Mark Harris. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jared Polis, Dean Williams, filed by Mark Harris.(angar, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND TO FILE AN AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies by submitting a certified account statement and filing an amended complaint that provides a short and plain statement of each claim he is asserting within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/6/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Mark Harris. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against Jared Polis, Williams, filed by Mark Harris.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less