This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 07:26:41 (UTC).

Harris v. Janssen

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Harris against Janssen in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02428

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Benjamin Lee Harris

Rush City, MN 55069

Benjamin L. Harris

Rush City, MN 55069

Respondent

Vicki Janssen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Matthew Frank

Attorney at Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1800

445 Minnesota St Ste 1800

St Paul, MN 55101-2134

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Appeal Packet

7 #1

Civil Notice - appeal

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(lmb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation #5 is ACCEPTED, this matter is DISMISSED, Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED AS MOOT, and no certificate of appealability will issue. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/7/2019. (RMM) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Benjamin L. Harris, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris filed by Benjamin L. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2019. (TJB) cc:Benjamin L. Harris. Modified text on 9/11/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

2 #1

Rescanned IFP Application

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Lee Harris re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. (JGK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Rescanned IFP Application) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Harris. Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(lmb) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: the Report and Recommendation #5 is ACCEPTED, this matter is DISMISSED, Petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED AS MOOT, and no certificate of appealability will issue. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/7/2019. (RMM) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs: Rescanned Application to include p. 3. (KMH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Benjamin L. Harris, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris filed by Benjamin L. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2019. (TJB) cc:Benjamin L. Harris. Modified text on 9/11/2019 (MMG). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Lee Harris re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. (JGK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Rescanned IFP Application) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benjamin Lee Harris. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Harris. Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.