This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:01:52 (UTC).

Harris v. Guild Mortgage LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Harris filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Guild Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Regina D Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Regina D Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marnay Harris

Warner Robins, GA 31088

Defendant

Guild Mortgage LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dylan W. Howard

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC- Atl

3414 Peachtree Road, Northeast

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Brief

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guild Mortgage LLC identifying Other Affiliate Guild Holdings Company for Guild Mortgage LLC. (Howard, Dylan) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (bnw) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guild Mortgage LLC identifying Other Affiliate Guild Holdings Company for Guild Mortgage LLC. (Howard, Dylan) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Guild Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Howard, Dylan) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Guild Mortgage LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12311859) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less