This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2020 at 08:17:48 (UTC).

Harris v. Fedex Custom Critical, Inc et al (TV2)

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Fedex Custom Critical, Inc TV2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrice Harris

Defendants

Fedex Custom Critical, Inc

Jennifer L Calabrese

Matthew P Calabrese

Federal Express Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy L Baldridge

Attorney at Garza Law Firm, PLLC

550 West Main Street, Suite 340

Knoxville, TN 37902

Marcos M Garza

Attorney at The Garza Law Firm, PLLC

550 Main Street, Suite 340

Knoxville, TN 37902

Keith Edgar Lowe

Attorney at Garza Law Firm, PLLC

550 West Main Street, Suite 340

Knoxville, TN 37902

Jenny C Rogers

Attorney at Garza Law Firm, PLLC

550 West Main Street, Suite 340

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorney

Joshua A Wolfe

Attorney at McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC (Knoxville)

520 West Summit Hill Drive, Suite 905

Knoxville, TN 37923

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc of Service of Discovery (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/3/20. (ABF) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Logistics, Inc., Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Custom Critical, Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc.(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn County Circuit, case number 19-CV-420. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4175405), filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Filings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc of Service of Discovery (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/3/20. (ABF) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Logistics, Inc., Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Custom Critical, Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc.(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 as to Fedex Custom Critical, Inc. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/30/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDistrict Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn County Circuit, case number 19-CV-420. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4175405), filed by Fedex Custom Critical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Filings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Express Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A Wolfe