This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 06:55:41 (UTC).

Harris v. Denully et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Harris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Denully. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01307

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laquan Devota Harris

Brooklyn, NY 11203

Defendants

Christopher Guardino

Shane Denully

Gilford Gittens

Micheal Hernandez

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-00521. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: This Court is not the appropriate court in which to file this action. If an action is filed in the wrong district court, a court "shall dismiss, or if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought." 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). In the interest of justice, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this actionto the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and close this case. Case transferred to the Southern District of New York. Case extracted via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/13/2020. (Greene, Donna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laquan Devota Harris. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Shane Denully, Gilford Gittens, Christopher Guardino, Micheal Hernandez, filed by Laquan Devota Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New York Eastern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-00521. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This Court is not the appropriate court in which to file this action. If an action is filed in the wrong district court, a court "shall dismiss, or if it be in the interest of justice, transfer such case to any district or division in which it could have been brought." 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). In the interest of justice, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this actionto the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and close this case. Case transferred to the Southern District of New York. Case extracted via ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/13/2020. (Greene, Donna) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laquan Devota Harris. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shane Denully, Gilford Gittens, Christopher Guardino, Micheal Hernandez, filed by Laquan Devota Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 2/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.