This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2021 at 08:01:55 (UTC).

HARRIS v. Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 HARRIS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald M. Middlebrooks and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81129

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRYSTAL HARRIS

Defendant

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon Alexis Ligon

Attorney at Ligon Law Group LLC dba PrettySMART Law

100 Biscayne Blvd, Suite 1114

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant Attorneys

Shayla Nicole Waldon

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3500

Miami, FL 33131

Jennifer A. Schwartz

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

One Biscayne Tower, 2 South Biscayne Blvd.

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cellco Partnership. (Schwartz, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#13

(#13) First RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/9/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Scheduling Conference with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#8

(#8) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. Responses due by 8/24/2021 (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#7

(#7) (STRICKEN PER DE#10)Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. (Ligon, Shannon)Text Modified on 8/12/2021 (cqs). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Alexis Ligon on behalf of CRYSTAL HARRIS (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cellco Partnership. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Waldon, Shayla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cellco Partnership. (Schwartz, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 3:20 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed prior to the scheduling conference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/12/2021. (no00) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines Per DE#11. Responses due by 8/17/2021 (cqs) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #8 Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks a 14-day extension to time to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #5 ). In support, Plaintiff makes a generalized reference to "substantial and meritorious issues" which cannot be briefed "adequately" and "fairly" unless an extension is granted. The requested relief is not opposed. Counsel is advised that motions to extend litigation deadlines must set forth good cause supported by specific facts. I do not find that the scant facts set forth in this motion show good cause for a two week extension. However I will grant the motion in part and extend Plaintiff's filing deadline to August 17, 2021. No further extensions will be granted absent well-explained and compelling reasons. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. (kal) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER striking #7 Motion for Extension of Time, in light of Plaintiff's filing of an Amended Motion seeking the same relief (DE #8 ). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. (kal) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/9/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Scheduling Conference with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. Responses due by 8/24/2021 (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (STRICKEN PER DE#10)Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CRYSTAL HARRIS. (Ligon, Shannon)Text Modified on 8/12/2021 (cqs). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Alexis Ligon on behalf of CRYSTAL HARRIS (Ligon, Shannon) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cellco Partnership. Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Waldon, Shayla) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant seeks a one-week extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's 10-count Complaint. I will grant the requested relief. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/8/2021. (hck) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waldon, Shayla) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14801380, filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, Jennifer) Modified Text on 6/28/2021 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Alexis Ligon