This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2021 at 08:22:11 (UTC).

HARRIS v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against CARNIVAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and John J. O'Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22859

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

John J. O'Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANDA HARRIS

Defendant

Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Lines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Charles Black

Attorney at Michael C. Black, P.A.

7700 North Kendall Drive, Suite 505

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHANDA HARRIS. Carnival Corporation waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Black, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (cds) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHANDA HARRIS. Carnival Corporation waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Black, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (cds) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CARNIVAL CORPORTAION. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14904311, filed by CHANDA HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Black, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carnival PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Black