This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2022 at 05:23:37 (UTC).

HARRIS v. APPLE, INC.

Case Summary

On November 29, 2022, LaToya Harris (“Plaintiff”), represented by Michael Patrick Murphy, Jr. of Murphy Law Group, LLC, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Apple, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking damages and interest for alleged discrimination on the basis of disability. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, with Judge Karen S. Marston presiding. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Plaintiff began her employment with Respondent on or about February 19, 2018 in the Position of Customer Relations Advisor.”

The plaintiff also stated, “By way of background, Plaintiff suffers from anxiety, depression, and post-traumatic stress disorder (‘PTSD’), which qualify as disabilities within the meaning of the ADA in that they substantially limit major life activities, including, but not limited to, her ability to handle stress, interact with others, and concentrate.” 

The plaintiff then alleged, “In or around September 2020, Plaintiff spoke to her then-manager, Alan Bradfield (‘Mr. Bradfield’), and requested a reasonable accommodation related to her disabilities.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Approximately three (3) days later, Mr. Bradfield informed Plaintiff that Defendant would not provide the requested accommodation because it ‘would set a precedent.’” 

Plaintiff also alleged, “Mr. Bradfield then informed Plaintiff that her only options were to stay in her current position or request a leave of absence. Mr. Bradfield referred Plaintiff to Sedgwick, Defendant’s leave coordination provider, and advised she must request a leave of absence through Sedgwick. Plaintiff requested a leave of absence related to her disabilities through Sedgwick, which began in or around September 2020.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “In or around the spring of 2021, Plaintiff learned she had a new manager, Qi Adkins (“Ms. Adkins”). Plaintiff asked Ms. Adkins about returning to work with the accommodation of being transferred to the Direct Dispatch position, but she never heard back from Ms. Adkins about this request.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Ms. Adkins eventually told Plaintiff that Defendant was not moving people to the Direct Dispatch department and that it would not transfer Plaintiff to that department. Additionally, [..] Defendant granted the requests to transfer to Direct Dispatch of employees who do not suffer from any disabilities.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “From October 2020 through November 2021, Plaintiff provided Sedgwick with approximately eight (8) notes from her doctor supporting her requests for accommodation, which, [..] Sedgwick provided to Defendant. However, as noted, Defendant rejected these notes from Plaintiff’s doctor and denied her requests for accommodation.” 

The plaintiff also alleged, “On or about December 1, 2021, Plaintiff resigned from her position with Defendant due to Defendant’s continued refusal to provide her with a reasonable accommodation.” 

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “In light of the foregoing, it is believed and therefore averred Defendant discriminated against and constructively discharged Plaintiff because of her actual and/or perceived disability, because of her past record of impairment, and in retaliation for her requests for an accommodation in connection thereto, in violation of the ADA.”

Plaintiff presented one claim for relief from alleged violation of Americans with Disabilities Act by discrimination, retaliation, & constructive discharge.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested an award of  back wages, front pay, bonuses, and compensatory damages not less than one hundred and fifty thousand dollars ($150,000) along with punitive damages and prejudgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04737

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAREN S. MARSTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATOYA HARRIS

Defendant

APPLE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to APPLE, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/29/22 (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LATOYA HARRIS. (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to APPLE, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/29/22 (JL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against APPLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16338526.), filed by LATOYA HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.