Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2019 at 07:13:35 (UTC).

Ozelia Harris v. American Fidelity Assurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Ozelia Harris filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Fidelity Assurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06236

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ozelia Harris

Defendants

American Fidelity Assurance Company

DOES 1-10

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monique Harris

Attorney at Harris APC

7615 Etiwanda Avenue No 36

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91739

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa M Cowan

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen T Tsui

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorenson LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER DENYING THE JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING PANEL MEDIATION #22 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Joint STIPULATION for Order Requesting Panel Mediation filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#20

(#20) *STRICKEN* STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Adrienne Publicover may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 9/11/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company(Tsui, Karen) Modified on 8/16/2019 (sr). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 19, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation).The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 13, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 17, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#17

(#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ADDENDUM TO THE RULE 26(F) REPORTS FILED AS DOC. NOS. 15 AND 16 ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company.. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#16

(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Ozelia Harris.. (Harris, Monique) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#15

(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Non-Joint Rule 26(f) Report ; estimated length of trial - 4 days, filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company.. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#7

(#8) DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 7/23/19. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#6

(#8) DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 7/23/19. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#5

(#8) DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 7/23/19. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

4 #1

Declaration Declaration of Proof of Service by Regular Mail (Exhibit 1 to Notice

#4

CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Fidelity Assurance Company, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ozelia Harris. Filed in State Court on 6/6/2019 Submitted with Exhibit 1 to Exhibit doc. #4 (car) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

1 #1

Declaration of Service by Mail (Removal Documents)

#1

(#4) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Exhibit 1 In Support of Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company's Notice of Removal of Civil Action) as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Proof of Service by Regular Mail (Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Civil Action))(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER DENYING THE JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING PANEL MEDIATION #22 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint STIPULATION for Order Requesting Panel Mediation filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Text Entry Order STRIKING the Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (ADR-2), [20. The parties were ordered to private mediation #18 . Counsel shall notify Ms. Publicover that she may act as a private mediator in this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) *STRICKEN* STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Adrienne Publicover may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 9/11/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company(Tsui, Karen) Modified on 8/16/2019 (sr). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 19, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation).The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 13, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 17, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ADDENDUM TO THE RULE 26(F) REPORTS FILED AS DOC. NOS. 15 AND 16 ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company.. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Ozelia Harris.. (Harris, Monique) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Non-Joint Rule 26(f) Report ; estimated length of trial - 4 days, filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company.. (Tsui, Karen) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ozelia Harris, identifying Ozelia Harris; American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Harris, Monique) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 7/23/19. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 19, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before August 5, 2019. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (lom) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Fidelity Assurance Company, Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Ozelia Harris. Filed in State Court on 6/6/2019 Submitted with Exhibit 1 to Exhibit doc. #4 (car) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Exhibit 1 In Support of Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company's Notice of Removal of Civil Action) as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Proof of Service by Regular Mail (Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Civil Action))(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company, (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19PSCV00520 Receipt No: 0973-24113868 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service by Mail (Removal Documents)) (Attorney Melissa M Cowan added to party American Fidelity Assurance Company(pty:dft))(Cowan, Melissa) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique Harris