This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 08:24:12 (UTC).

Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Harris filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04179

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel Harris

Snellville, GA 30078

Ertha Harris

Snellville, GA 30078

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, NA

American Servicing Company

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Arthur Allen Ebbs

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US), LLP-Atl

Suite 2400, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC) for American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (eop) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Disclosures by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris.(tcc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. Wells Fargo Bank, NA served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (jpa) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Security Deed

#8

(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. (tcc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel Harris and Ertha Harris. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #2

Exhibit B - Assignments

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Assignments)(Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of the #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aaq) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. (tcc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Disclosures by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris.(tcc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company (WFC) for American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process with Brief In Support by American Servicing Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Security Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Assignments)(Ebbs, Arthur) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service Executed by Daniel Harris, Ertha Harris. Wells Fargo Bank, NA served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (jpa) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (eop) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel Harris and Ertha Harris. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115740) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.