This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2021 at 08:30:57 (UTC).

Harris et al v. USA Waste Management Resources, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USA Waste Management Resources, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01999

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clifford Harris

Gerald Davis

Andrew Kantack

Defendant

USA Waste Management Resources, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William RH Merrill

Attorney at Susman Godfrey

1000 Louisiana, Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Joseph M. Lyon

Attorney at The Lyon Firm

2754 Eric Ave

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Krysta Kauble Pachman

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6029

Terence R. Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Ste 45209

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Final Dismissal. Having been advised that Clifford Harris, Andrew Kantack, and Gerald Davis no longer wishes to pursue their claims against USA Waste-Management Resources, LLC, the case is dismissed without prejudice. (11)(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Dismissal as to USA Waste Management Resources, LLC by Clifford Harris, Gerald Davis, Andrew Kantack, filed. (Merrill, William) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerald Davis, Clifford Harris, Andrew Kantack, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2021. (Merrill, William) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Krysta Kauble Pachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Terence R. Coates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Krysta Kauble Pachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerald Davis, Clifford Harris, Andrew Kantack, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/16/2021. (Merrill, William) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Terence R. Coates to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gerald Davis, Clifford Harris, Andrew Kantack, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2021. (Merrill, William) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes( Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to USA Waste Management Resources, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to USA Waste Management Resources, LLC, filed.(Merrill, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against USA Waste Management Resources, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26616520) filed by Clifford Harris, Gerald Davis, Andrew Kantack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merrill, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krysta Kauble Pachman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Michael Lyon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terence Richard Coates

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. H. Merrill