This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:40:16 (UTC).

Harris et al v. Phoenix, City of et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Harris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Phoenix, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessica Perez

Roland G Harris

Rodasia White

Defendants

Kristopher Bertz

Unknown Parties

Phoenix, City of

Unknown Norman

David Norman

Unknown Bertz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas C Horne

Attorney at Horne Slaton PLLC

6720 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85253

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen L Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 209

Tempe, AZ 85281

Lea S Shapiro

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 209

Tempe, AZ 85281

Christina Gail Retts

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group PLC

1095 W Rio Salado Pkwy., Ste. 209

Tempe, AZ 85281

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roland G Harris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/21/2020 to Kristopher Bertz . (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/16/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#1) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-057512. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17828459. filed by David Norman, Phoenix, City of, Kristopher Bertz. (Retts, Christina) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-4)(DLC) * Modified to seal per #4 on 1/13/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Phoenix, City of. (Retts, Christina) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal Complaint (redacted) by Roland G Harris. (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/16/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17828459. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-78-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

(#10) * Notice of Service of #6 Order Doc upon Defendant (Horne, Thomas) *Modified on 1/22/2020 to correct event type (MSA). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Phoenix, City of.(Retts, Christina) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#13

(#13) (Defendants Bertz and Norman) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kristopher Bertz, David Norman, Phoenix, City of.(Retts, Christina) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roland G Harris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/21/2020 to David Norman . (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (Defendants Bertz and Norman) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kristopher Bertz, David Norman, Phoenix, City of.(Retts, Christina) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roland G Harris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/21/2020 to David Norman . (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Roland G Harris: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 01/21/2020 to Kristopher Bertz . (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) * Notice of Service of #6 Order Doc upon Defendant (Horne, Thomas) *Modified on 1/22/2020 to correct event type (MSA). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Phoenix, City of. (Retts, Christina) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Phoenix, City of.(Retts, Christina) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/16/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/16/2020. (MMO) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal Complaint (redacted) by Roland G Harris. (Horne, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit a corrected version of the complaint, redacting the minor's names, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3), no later than January 21, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is to be sealed. The Clerk of the Court is to seal the Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. #1 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that future filings in this matter referencing the minor(s) shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/13/20. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17828459. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-78-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration & Demand for Jury upon City of Phoenix on 12/13/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/19/2019) (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-057512. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17828459. filed by David Norman, Phoenix, City of, Kristopher Bertz. (Retts, Christina) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1-4)(DLC) * Modified to seal per #4 on 1/13/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.