This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 10:47:04 (UTC).

Harris et al v. Chicanos Por La Causa Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Harris filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Chicanos Por La Causa Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00615

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Harris

Caitlyn Polston

Defendant

Chicanos Por La Causa Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua William Carden

Attorney at Carden Livesay Limited

16427 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 410

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 9, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/14/21. (MAW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19345770. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-615-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19345770 filed by Eric Harris, Caitlyn Polston. (Carden, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 9, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/14/21. (MAW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19345770. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-615-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19345770 filed by Eric Harris, Caitlyn Polston. (Carden, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicanos Por La Causa Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua William Carden