This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2021 at 14:25:25 (UTC).

Harris et al v. Accordia Life and Annuity Company(CONSENT)

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Harris filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Accordia Life and Annuity Company CONSENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Russ Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Russ Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christa Harris

Jason Harris

Defendant

Accordia Life and Annuity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry Shane Seaborn

Attorney at Penn and Seaborn, LLC

Post Office Box 688

Clayton, AL 36016

Charles Davenport Hudson

Attorney at Penn & Seaborn, LLC

1971 Berry Chase Place

Montgomery, AL 36117

Spencer Wayne Danzey

Attorney at The Danzey Firm, PC

Po Box 608

Abbeville, AL 36310-0608

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North; Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emily C. Burke

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale

1901 6Th Ave N Suite 1700, None

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Ethan McDaniel

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

1901 6Th Avenue North; Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #5

State Court Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Christa Harris, Jason Harris. (dmn, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (dmn, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Accordia Life and Annuity Company of Settlement (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing that the plf file a response to the #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court on or before 6/18/2021; directing counsel for the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 6/24/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/4/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court of Henry County, Alabama and Attorney's Fees by Christa Harris, Jason Harris. (Seaborn, Larry) Modified on 5/10/2021 to reflect proper title and civil event code. (dmn, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christa Harris, Jason Harris. (Seaborn, Larry) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All Parties, Accordia Life and Annuity Company, Christa Harris, Jason Harris. (dmn, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Burke, Emily) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Accordia Life and Annuity Company.(dmn, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE by Accordia Life and Annuity Company of Filing #1 Notice of Removal with Circuit Court of Henry County, AL. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christa Harris, Jason Harris. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Accordia Life and Annuity Company, filed by Jason Harris, Christa Harris.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Accordia Life and Annuity Company from Circuit Court of Henry County, AL, case number 37-CV-21-900007.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 46024602063068) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Filing Fee Receipt, #5 State Court Complaint)(dmn, ) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accordia Life and Annuity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily C. Burke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. McDaniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua R Hess