Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 07:40:07 (UTC).

Harris-El v. Clark et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Harris-El filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CT-03211

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin L. Harris-El

Lumberton, NC 28359

Defendants

Harvey Clay

Nurse Betty Clark

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) Letter from Calvin L. Harris-El regarding an extension of time for missing receipts. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/13/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/26/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Calvin L. Harris-El. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/17/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Calvin L. Harris-El at Lumberton Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Betty Clark and Harvey Clay filed by Calvin L. Harris-El. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Calvin L. Harris-El regarding an extension of time for missing receipts. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/13/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/26/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INCOMPLETE Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Calvin L. Harris-El. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Calvin L. Harris-El. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/17/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Calvin L. Harris-El at Lumberton Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Betty Clark and Harvey Clay filed by Calvin L. Harris-El. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less